Miller v. Bostick et al

Plaintiff: Reco Miller and Reco Lamont Miller
Defendant: Warden Bucken, Warden Cohen and Margaret Bostick
Case Number: 9:2019cv01794
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Reco Miller. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time by Reco Miller. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Reco Miller. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #6 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, AO240, Fin.Cert, (3)Summons ad (3)USM-285s, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Reco Miller, #310609, Ridgeland Correctional Institution, PO Box 2039, Ridgeville, SC, 29936 (dsto, )
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 8/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 8/2/2019. (dsto, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (dsto, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Margaret Bostick, Warden Bucken, Warden Cohen, filed by Reco Miller. Service due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Bostick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reco Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reco Lamont Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Bucken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Bostick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?