Dill et al v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Frankie A Dill and Melinda Gay Dill
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 9:2019cv02003
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint - Social Security, filed by Frankie A Dill, Melinda Gay Dill. It is recommended that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, in accordance with Rule 41, Fed.R.Civ.P. Objections to R&R due by 9/27/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 09/13/2019. (cpeg, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Frankie A Dill and Melinda Gay Dill 35 Chestnut St Startex, SC 29377. (cpeg, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REFERENCE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/22/2019.(cpeg, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/22/2019. (cpeg, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Frankie A Dill, Melinda Gay Dill. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (cpeg, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Frankie A Dill, Melinda Gay Dill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpeg, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Melinda Gay Dill, Frankie A Dill. Service due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter)(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dill et al v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie A Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Gay Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?