Schuler v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Paula Ann Schuler
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 9:2019cv02385
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula Ann Schuler. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 8/29/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents US Attorney's Office Affidavit of Service; Commissioner of SS Proof of Service; and US Attorney General Proof of Service)(Owens, Brett)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/30/2019. (jbry, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Paula Ann Schuler.. (Owens, Brett)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cpeg, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8632937.) Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Paula Ann Schuler. Service due by 11/21/2019(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuler v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Ann Schuler
Represented By: Brett A Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?