Stephan v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Edward C Stephan
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 9:2019cv02623
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order to Show Cause placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Christopher Kyle Johnston Law Office of Christopher K Johnston LLC 268 Ponce de Leon Ave., Ste. 1020 San Juan, PR 00918 (asni, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/5/2019. (asni, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Connor, Andrew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marvin Connor on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Connor, Andrew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-03977. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of South Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]
October 28, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-3977-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]
October 28, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14809020 filed by Edward C Stephan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephan v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Marvin Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Marvin Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward C Stephan
Represented By: Christopher Kyle Johnston
Represented By: Carlos M Hernandez-Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?