Faulk-Walter v. Pulte Homes et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne Faulk-Walter
Defendant: Pulte Homes, Pulte Home Corporation, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc, Pulte Home Company LLC and John Does 1-50
Case Number: 9:2020cv00159
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Suzanne Faulk-Walter.(Toney, Andrew)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 10/20/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/26/2020. (sshe, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/22/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/21/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/29/2020, Discovery due by 9/20/2020, Motion in Limine 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 10/3/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for jury selection and/or trial on or after 1/1/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/26/2020. (sshe, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Pulte Home Company LLC, Pulte Home Corporation, Pulte Homes, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc.(Rawl, A)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Pulte Home Company LLC, Pulte Home Corporation, Pulte Homes, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Scheduling Order, #2 Mediation of Cases Pending Before Judge Gergel, #3 Rule 26(f) Joint Discovery Plan)(Rawl, A)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/12/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/26/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/26/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/21/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/22/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/29/2020, Discovery due by 7/20/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 8/3/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 11/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/22/2020. (sshe, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Pulte Home Company LLC, Pulte Home Corporation, Pulte Homes, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc.(Rawl, A)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pulte Home Company LLC, Pulte Home Corporation, Pulte Homes, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc.(sshe, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-07-02259. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8886376), filed by Pulte Home Corporation, Pulte Homes, Pulte Home Company LLC, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulk-Walter v. Pulte Homes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Homes
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: Brittany Tanya Bihun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Home Corporation
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: Brittany Tanya Bihun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: Brittany Tanya Bihun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Home Company LLC
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: Brittany Tanya Bihun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Faulk-Walter
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?