Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC et al v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: J Mitchell Brown and Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Dana Roll, One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD, International Marine Underwriters, Lowcountry Insurance Services LLC, Jeffrey S Althoff and Correll Insurance Group LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv01204
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 12/28/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/14/2020. (sshe, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/28/2020,, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/27/2020,, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/27/2020,, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/4/2020,, Discovery due by 11/27/2020,, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection,, Motions due by 12/13/2020,, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection,, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection,, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 3/1/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/14/2020. (sshe, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, International Marine Underwriters, One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD.(Buckley, Edward)
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by J Mitchell Brown, Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC. (Tinsley, Mark)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, International Marine Underwriters, One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/4/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Buckley, Edward)
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY in Opposition re #13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by J Mitchell Brown, Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Case Glazer vs. Honeywell)(Tinsley, Mark) Modified on 4/23/2020, per filing user's request, to correct document link (rshu, ).
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Crossclaim #5 by Jeffrey S Althoff, Correll Insurance Group LLC, Lowcountry Insurance Services LLC, Dana Roll.(Powell, Warren)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Jeffrey S Althoff, Correll Insurance Group LLC, Lowcountry Insurance Services LLC, Dana Roll.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/24/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Powell, Warren)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/23/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent)(Buckley, Edward)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, International Marine Underwriters, One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD.(Buckley, Edward)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by J Mitchell Brown, Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC.(Tinsley, Mark)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim #5 by J Mitchell Brown, Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC.(Tinsley, Mark)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response to Motion due by 4/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by J Mitchell Brown, Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Tinsley, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeffrey S Althoff, Correll Insurance Group LLC, Lowcountry Insurance Services LLC, Dana Roll. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Powell, Warren)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Motion to Remand)No proposed order.(Tinsley, Mark)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/21/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/5/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 5/5/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/29/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/29/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/28/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/4/2020, Discovery due by 9/28/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 10/13/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 1/1/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/31/2020. (sshe, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against Lowcountry Insurance Services LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against J Mitchell Brown, Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC by International Marine Underwriters, One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Buckley, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2020: #2 Exhibit Lease Agreement) (sshe, ). Modified on 4/28/2020 to add attachment, inadvertently not filed, per filing user's request(sshe, ).
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, International Marine Underwriters, One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD.(sshe, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Jeffrey S Althoff, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Correll Insurance Group LLC, International Marine Underwriters, Lowcountry Insurance Services LLC, Dana Roll. (sshe, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-07-00815. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9025196), filed by One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Consent to Removal, #3 Certificate of Service)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC et al v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Represented By: William Cole Shannon
Represented By: Nicholas James Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Roll
Represented By: Warren C Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Beacon Insurance Group Holdings LTD
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Represented By: William Cole Shannon
Represented By: Nicholas James Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Marine Underwriters
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Represented By: William Cole Shannon
Represented By: Nicholas James Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowcountry Insurance Services LLC
Represented By: Warren C Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Althoff
Represented By: Warren C Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correll Insurance Group LLC
Represented By: Warren C Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Mark B Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Dock & Platform LLC
Represented By: Mark B Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?