Grant v. Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary D Grant
Defendant: William E. Gavigan, GSI, LLC, Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Bull Point SC, LLC, German American Capital Corporation, Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Inc., DB Aster, LLC, Bull Point Plantation Owners Association, Inc., Does 1 through 100 and Bull Point, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv01582
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Summons and Complaint by Gary D. Grant. (hada, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order Service - Non-Inmate, #14 Summons Issued, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Gary D Grant, 26546 Mambrino, Mission Viejo, CA 92691. (hada, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Bull Point Plantation Owners Association, Inc., Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Inc., Bull Point SC, LLC, Bull Point, LLC, DB Aster, LLC, GSI, LLC, William E. Gavigan, German American Capital Corporation. Service due by 9/8/2020. (hada, )
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/08/2020. (hada, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Gary D. Grant. (hada, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SCX200017107 (hada, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Gary D Grant, 26546 Mambrino, Mission Viejo, CA. 92691 (hada, )
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 5/26/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 05/04/2020. (hada, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gary D Grant.(hada, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bull Point Plantation Owners Association, Inc., Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Inc., Bull Point SC, LLC, DB Aster, LLC, Does 1 through 100, GSI, LLC, William E. Gavigan, German American Capital Corporation, filed by Gary D Grant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Gavigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Point SC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German American Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Point Plantation Property Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Aster, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Point Plantation Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Point, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?