Moore v. Warden FCI Edgefield
Petitioner: Michael Moore
Respondent: Warden FCI Edgefield
Case Number: 9:2020cv02089
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
2 Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Clerk Notes Case Assign Public placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Michael Moore 34569-183 EDGEFIELD FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 725 EDGEFIELD, SC 29824 (sshe, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Michael Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpeg, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Michael Moore 34569-183 EDGEFIELD FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 725 EDGEFIELD, SC 29824 (cpeg, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 7/31/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 07/10/2020. (cpeg, )
July 9, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry. Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant no longer assigned to the case. (swil, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Warden FCI Edgefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden FCI Edgefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?