Beaton v. State of South Carolina
Petitioner: Vincent Jerode Beaton
Respondent: State of South Carolina
Case Number: 9:2020cv02096
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
2 Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Clerk Notes Case Assign Public placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Vincent Jerode Beaton 196947 Lee Correctional Institution F2 B Rm 2210 990 Wisacky Hwy Bishopville, SC 29010 (sshe, )
July 9, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry. Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant no longer assigned to the case. (swil, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Vincent Beaton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(cpeg, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION by Vincent Jerode Beaton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(cpeg, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Vincent Jerode Beaton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaton v. State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent Jerode Beaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?