Pinckney v. U.S. District Court Officials
Plaintiff: Henry Lee Pinckney
Defendant: U.S. District Court Officials
Case Number: 9:2020cv02960
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Henry Lee Pinckney 127389 Lieber Correctional Institution P.O. Box 205 Ridgeville, SC 29472 (cpeg, ) Modified on 9/17/2020 to add docket text (cpeg, ).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 10/8/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 09/17/2020. (cpeg, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (cpeg, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. District Court Officials, filed by Henry Lee Pinckney. Service due by 11/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinckney v. U.S. District Court Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lee Pinckney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. District Court Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?