Fulmer v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Robert M. Fulmer
Defendant: Doe 1, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Sergeant Brown, Doe 3 and Doe 2
Case Number: 9:2020cv02971
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert M. Fulmer 317783 Lieber Correctional Institution P.O. Box 205 Ridgeville, SC 29472 (cpeg, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER-Plaintiff should provide any additional identification or location information he may have for this Defendant without delay. The Court will then issue such additional orders and instructions as are necessary or appropriate. Plaintiff is herein advised that this Defendant may be dismissed as a party Defendant if he is not served with process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 10/15/2020. (cpeg, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Restricted Access) by Robert M. Fulmer as to Brown. (cpeg, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order 1983, 10 Reference order placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert M. Fulmer 317783 Lieber Correctional Institution P.O. Box 205 Ridgeville, SC 29472 (cpeg, ) Modified on 8/25/2020 (cpeg, ).
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Brown, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Service due by 11/23/2020 (cpeg, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REFERENCE #8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 08/24/2020.(cpeg, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 08/24/2020. (cpeg, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (cpeg, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Robert M. Fulmer. Response to Motion due by 8/31/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate)No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(cpeg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #2 Envelope) (cpeg, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brown, Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, South Carolina Department of Corrections, filed by Robert M. Fulmer. Service due by 11/16/2020(cpeg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #1 Envelope) (cpeg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulmer v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Fulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?