Baker v. United States of America
Petitioner: Julius Wayne Baker
Respondent: United States of America and Warden of USP-Lewisburg
Case Number: 9:2020cv03383
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Julius Wayne Baker 98304-004 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590 (cpeg, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- Petitioner's motion to extend time (ECF No. #8 ) to bring this action into proper form is GRANTED and the time for Petitioner to bring this action into proper form is extended until December 11, 2020. Petitioner is again warned that if does not bring this case into proper form within the time permitted under this Order, this case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute and comply with an order of this court under Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 11/19/2020.(cpeg, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Proper Form Order and Notice of Change of address by Julius Wayne Baker. Note- Address changed in ECF this date. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(cpeg, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Julius Wayne Baker #98304-004 LEWISBURG U.S. PENITENTIARY Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 1000 LEWISBURG, PA 17837 (cpeg, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 10/27/2020. (cpeg, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Julius Wayne Baker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julius Wayne Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of USP-Lewisburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?