Vera et al v. Renaud
Plaintiff: Eduardo Enrique Vera and Venessa Marin Aragon
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Case Number: 9:2021cv00391
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Marie Cundari on behalf of Tracy Renaud (Cundari, Tina)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Robert de Holl on behalf of Tracy Renaud (de Holl, Andrew)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eduardo Enrique Vera, Venessa Marin Aragon. Tracy Renaud served on 2/16/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt)(Banias, Bradley)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tracy Renaud (U.S. Attorney). (vdru, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tracy Renaud (U.S. Attorney General). (vdru, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tracy Renaud (US Citizenship and Immigration Services). (vdru, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Venessa Marin Aragon, Eduardo Enrique Vera.(vdru, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tracy Renaud ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9635813.), filed by Eduardo Enrique Vera, Venessa Marin Aragon. Service due by 5/11/2021. (vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera et al v. Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Enrique Vera
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venessa Marin Aragon
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Andrew Robert de Holl
Represented By: Tina Marie Cundari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?