Gardner v. Stork et al
Plaintiff: Louise Legare Gardner
Defendant: Brock and Scott PLLC, William P Stork and PHH Mortgage Services (New Rez)
Case Number: 9:2021cv00720
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Louise Legare Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hcor, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brock and Scott PLLC, PHH Mortgage Services (New Rez), William P Stork, filed by Louise Legare Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(hcor, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Louise Legare Gardner PO Box 3443 Bluffton, SC 29910 (hada, )
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 4/19/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 03/29/2021. (hada, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Restraining Order Injunction, and MOTION for Emergency Hearing by Louise Legare Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hada, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brock and Scott PLLC, PHH Mortgage Services (New Rez), William P Stork ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number SCX200017770.), filed by Louise Legare Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Stork et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock and Scott PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Stork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services (New Rez)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Legare Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?