Bassford v. Bassford
Plaintiff: Scott Louis Bassford
Defendant: Patricia Ann Bassford
Case Number: 9:2021cv02955
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Response filed by Scott Louis Bassford.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/20/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Withrow, Daphne)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Remand Response filed by Scott Louis Bassford. (Withrow, Daphne)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Patricia Ann Bassford. Response to Motion due by 10/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hricik, Richard)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Remand Response filed by Patricia Ann Bassford.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/6/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Hricik, Richard)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Jill R. Kroamer for 11/22-26/2021. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/27/2021. (eric, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Scott Louis Bassford.(Withrow, Daphne)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Jill R Kroamer for 11/22/2021-11/26/2021 (Kroamer, Jill)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand by Scott Louis Bassford. Response to Motion due by 10/8/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Probate Court Consent Order)No proposed order.(Withrow, Daphne)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Daphne S. Withrow for 10/29-11/10/2021. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/21/2021. (eric, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Daphne S Withrow for Oct 29 2021 through November 10 2021 (Withrow, Daphne)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Petition by Patricia Ann Bassford. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(Hricik, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patricia Ann Bassford.(hcor, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Probate Court of Berkeley County, South Carolina, case number 2021ES0700318. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10071873), filed by Patricia Ann Bassford. (Attachments: #1 Probate Court Documents, #2 Consent Order, #3 Probate Court Case Docket)(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bassford v. Bassford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Louis Bassford
Represented By: Daphne S Withrow
Represented By: Jill R Kroamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ann Bassford
Represented By: Richard A Hricik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?