Koning v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Laura P Koning
Defendant: Bank of America NA and Navy Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 9:2021cv03691
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Laura P Koning Without Prejudice as to Navy Federal Credit Union, Only (Maxfield, Dave)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ordered that NFCU is granted a 21 day extension of time (through 1/7/2022) to file its responsive pleading. Navy Federal Credit Union answer due 1/7/2022. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/15/2021.(vdru, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Navy Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Farley, William)
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Laura P Koning.(Maxfield, Dave)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Navy Federal Credit Union.(Farley, William)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Navy Federal Credit Union answer due 12/17/2021. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/19/2021.(vdru, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of America NA.(McPherson, Thomas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Navy Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 12/1/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Farley, William)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bank of America NA.(vdru, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-07-01798. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10180609), filed by Bank of America NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: A: State Court Documents).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koning v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura P Koning
Represented By: Dave Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Thomas Richmond McPherson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By: William Joseph Farley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?