Highers v. BriteLife Recovery at Hilton Head, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jessika Highers
Defendant: BriteLife Recovery at Hilton Head, LLC and Dennis Koleda
Case Number: 9:2021cv03860
Filed: November 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5 Reason: Attorney filing user refiled for corrected signature document Corrected Filing Document Number #6 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 12/16/2021 (sshe, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Jessika Highers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Waiver of Service)(Martens, Casey) Modified to correct filing date on 12/21/2021 (sshe, ).
November 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BriteLife Recovery at Hilton Head, LLC, Dennis Koleda. (rshu, )
November 26, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jessika Highers. (rshu, )
November 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jessika Highers against BriteLife Recovery at Hilton Head, LLC, and Dennis Koleda ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10204199.). Service due by 2/24/2022. (rshu, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highers v. BriteLife Recovery at Hilton Head, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessika Highers
Represented By: Casey Merrell Martens
Represented By: Molly Hamilton Cawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BriteLife Recovery at Hilton Head, LLC
Represented By: William Robert Gignilliat, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Koleda
Represented By: William Robert Gignilliat, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?