Lopez v. Stirling et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Defendant: Bryan P. Stirling and Alan Wilson
Respondent: Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution
Case Number: 9:2022cv00250
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent's Return is due by April 22, 2022. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 03/22/2022.(apsn) Modified on 3/23/2022 to correct docket text(apsn).
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time by Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution. Response to Motion due by 4/4/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(Battenfield, Julianna)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Julianna Battenfield on behalf of Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution (Battenfield, Julianna)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution. (Brown, Melody)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER authorizing service of process. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Return and Memorandum due by 3/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 01/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (egra, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt number BSCDC-10302208.), filed by Daniel Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Appendix transcript of dash cam, #2 Appendix trial transcript vol 1, #3 Appendix appendix transcript vol 2, #4 State Court Documents state court documents coa opinion, #5 Supporting Documents Exhibit 4 Discovery Request, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Officer Discipline, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Officer Training, #8 State Court Documents Writ of pcr habeas, #9 Supporting Documents Pro se filing)(dgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Represented By: Aimee Jendrzejewski Zmroczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P. Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Tyger River Correctional Institution
Represented By: Julianna Battenfield
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?