Jamison v. Warden Peeples
Petitioner: Andra Jamison
Respondent: Warden Peeples
Case Number: 9:2022cv00300
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Warden Peeples. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Melody)
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Order 2254, 10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Andra Jamison 337461 Trenton Correctional Institution 84 Green House Rd Trenton, SC 29847. (apsn)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REFERENCE ORDER #9 granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 03/24/2022.(apsn)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER authorizing service of process. Motion for Extension of Time #8 is GRANTED; Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis #7 is GRANTED. Return and Memorandum due by 5/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 03/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition)(apsn)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time for case to be brought into Proper Form by Andra Jamison. Response to Motion due by 4/5/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 NEFs, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(apsn)
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access). (Response to Motion due by 4/5/2022). Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. )by Andra Jamison. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry. (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2022: #1 Envelope) (apsn). Modified on 3/23/2022 to update docket text(apsn).
March 11, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Andra Jamison. Updated address ***DOCUMENT RE-MAILED #3 Proper Form Order, and proper form document (Form AO-240) placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Andra Jamison 337461 Trenton Correctional Institution 84 Green House Rd Trenton, SC 29847. (apsn) Modified on 3/11/2022 to update docket text(apsn).
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #3 Proper Form Order and the proper form document (Form AO-240) placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Andra Jamison 337461 Trenton Correctional Institution 84 State Hwy S-19-29 Trenton, SC 29847. (apsn)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 3/10/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 02/17/2022. (apsn)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Andra Jamison. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 State Court Documents)(apsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamison v. Warden Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andra Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Peeples
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?