Norman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shanika Norman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record and US Attorney - Social Security Noticing
Case Number: 9:2023cv04518
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/12/2023. (tsim, )
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 9/12/2023. (tsim, )
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Shanika Norman.. (Cotten, Lisa)
September 11, 2023 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The parties attention is directed to the Courts Standing Order Regarding All Social Security Appeals Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Courts website.* Not later than thirty days from the entry of this Text Order, Plaintiffs counsel shall file a (1) signed and completed Notice, Consent, and Reference of the Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, or (2) status report informing the Court Plaintiff withholds consent to disposition of Plaintiffs appeal by a United States Magistrate Judge. IT IS SO ORDERED. * https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing_Order_Regarding_Social_Security_Cases.pdf Entered at the direction of the Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/11/2023. (tsim, )
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 11/7/2023. (tsim, )
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Shanika Norman. Response to Motion due by 9/22/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry. (tsim, )
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Shanika Norman. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.03 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website. (tsim, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanika Norman
Represented By: Lisa Long Cotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Attorney - Social Security Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?