Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. et al v. Omni Construction Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. and Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C.
Defendant: Omni Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01021
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Referring Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 JUDGMENT Confirming Arbitration Award. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/25/18. (SLW)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/25/18. (SLW)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER by Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. with PROPOSED JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD (Hall, Ronald)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.. (Hall, Ronald)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Support Documents served on Omni Construction Company, Inc. c/o CT Corp. on 09/12/2018, filed by Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judgment Thereon, #2 Attachment Exhibit A to Motion, #3 Attachment Exhibit B to Motion, #4 Attachment Affidavit of Ronald J. Hall, #5 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion)(Hall, Ronald)
September 11, 2018 Case Reassigned to U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange. (DLC)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Charles B. Kornmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/11/18. (SB)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 09/10/2018. (SAC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF #1 MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON by Plaintiffs Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C., Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. (SAC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Ronald J. Hall. (SAC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received from Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C., Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX300003017. (SAC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SAC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON filed by Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C., Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form of Agreement Between Primrose and Contractor, #2 Exhibit B - Final Awrd of Arbitrators) (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. et al v. Omni Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ronald J. Hall
Represented By: Mark William McNeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ronald J. Hall
Represented By: Mark William McNeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?