United States of America v. Hearnen et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Plains Commerce Bank, State of South Dakota, CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC and Travis Lee Hearnen
Case Number: 1:2018cv01022
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Amended Complaint,, #6 Summons Reissued Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Ramsdell, Alison)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Acknowledgment of Service was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Roche, Meghan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 Filed in error: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Amended Complaint,, #6 Summons Reissued Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Roche, Meghan) Modified on 11/8/2018 (SLW).
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Travis Lee Hearnen served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Ramsdell, Alison)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Ramsdell, Alison)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Amended Complaint,, #6 Summons Reissued Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Ramsdell, Alison)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC, Plains Commerce Bank, State of South Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Plains Commerce Bank, #2 State of South Dakota)(SLW)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by United States of America. (Ramsdell, Alison)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1-Note Loan 02, #2 Exhibit Exh 2-Note Loan 03, #3 Exhibit Exh 3-Note Loan 05, #4 Exhibit Exh 4-Note Loan 06, #5 Exhibit Exh 5-Note Loan 07, #6 Exhibit Exh 6-Payoff All Loans, #7 Exhibit Exh 7-Sec Agmt 02-10-11, #8 Exhibit Exh 8-Sec Agmt 05-31-12, #9 Exhibit Exh 9-Sec Agmt 06-06-13, #10 Exhibit Exh 10-Sec Agmt 06-14-17, #11 Exhibit Exh 11-Sec Agmt 08-19-14, #12 Exhibit Exh 12-Sec Agmt 01-14-15, #13 Exhibit Exh 13-Sec Agmt 08-02-16, #14 Exhibit Exh 14-UCC Filings, #15 Exhibit Exh 15-Noice of Acceleration, #16 Exhibit Exh 16-Other Lienholders, #17 Exhibit Exh 17-State Tax Lien) (Ramsdell, Alison)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Four original summons, five A085 forms and one Rule 73 memo delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (DJP)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Promissory Note 2/10/11, #2 Ex 2 - Promissory Note 5/21/12, #3 Ex 3 - Promissory Note 8/19/14, #4 Ex 4 - Promissory Note 8/19/14, #5 Ex 5 - Promissory Note 3/11/15, #6 Ex 6 - Total Payoff, #7 Ex 7 - Security Agreement 2/10/11, #8 Security Agreement 5/21/12, #9 Ex 9 - Security Agreement 6/6/13, #10 Ex 10 - Security Agreement 6/17/14, #11 Ex 11 = Security Agreement 8/19/14, #12 Ex 12 - Secrity Agreement 1/14/15, #13 Ex 13 - Security Agreement 8/2/16, #14 Ex 14 - Ltr from USDA to Hearnen 10/26/17, #15 Ex 15 - UCC Lien Certified Search Report, #16 Ex 16 - Notice of Tax Lien) (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hearnen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains Commerce Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Lee Hearnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?