Powdercoat, Inc. v. Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Powdercoat, Inc.
Defendant: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01008
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 & #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Larry E. Bache and Jonathan Bukowski. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 07/01/2019. (KLE)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Jonathan Bukowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Powdercoat, Inc. ( paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3075804) (Samp, Rollyn) Modified on 6/4/2019 to add payment information (KLE).
June 4, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Samp, Rollyn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Larry E. Bache to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3075838) by Powdercoat, Inc.. (Samp, Rollyn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION for Attorney Jonathan Bukowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3075804) by Powdercoat, Inc.. (Samp, Rollyn) Modified on 6/4/2019 to add text and terminate motion (KLE).
June 4, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Letter Sent was filed in error and should be disregarded. (KLE)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 [FILED IN ERROR] Letter as to Order for Discovery Report to Counsel from United States District Judge Charles Kornmann. (KLE) Modified on 6/4/2019 (KLE).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 06/03/2019. (KLE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #1 Attachment) (KLE).
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Rasmussen, Reed)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed A. Rasmussen on behalf of Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Rasmussen, Reed)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Powdercoat, Inc. . (Samp, Rollyn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3052365) filed by Powdercoat, Inc. in shell case on 5/6/19. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powdercoat, Inc. v. Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Reed A. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powdercoat, Inc.
Represented By: Rollyn H. Samp
Represented By: Larry E. Bache
Represented By: Jonathan Bukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?