Golliher-Weyer v. Young et al
Petitioner: Joseph Allen Golliher-Weyer
Respondent: Warden Darin Young and The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Case Number: 1:2019cv01020
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION by Petitioner Joseph Allen Golliher-Weyer re #7 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (SKK)
October 21, 2019 RECEIVED Brown County criminal case 06CRI14-43 and civil case 06CIV16-482. The record is located on Clerk of Court N Drive. SD Supreme Court Cases 27412 and 28563 also located on N drive. (SLW)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Darin Young served on 10/9/19. (SKK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE as to The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota served on 10/8/19. (SKK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota, Darin Young. (Wald, Sherri)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota, Darin Young. (Wald, Sherri)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE. Sent to Darin Young and Attorney General of South Dakota via Email and Certified Mail and to Joseph Allen Golliner-Weyer via USPS. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 10/7/19. (SKK)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration by Joseph Allen Golliher-Weyer. (SKK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Copy of docket sheet and motion to proceed IFP sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SKK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Inmate Filing of Joseph Allen Golliher-Weyer. (SKK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SKK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Joseph Allen Golliher-Weyer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golliher-Weyer v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Darin Young
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Allen Golliher-Weyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?