Hartse et al v. Murphy et al
Plaintiff: BPLH, Tara L. Hartse, KFH, Dustin L. Hartse and BATH
Defendant: Lake Norden, South Dakota and Jimmy Murphy
Case Number: 1:2019cv01025
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tara L. Hartse. Lake Norden, South Dakota waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Pochop, Stephanie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lake Norden, South Dakota, Jimmy Murphy. Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(DLC)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Devon M. Jacob for Dustin L. Hartse,Devon M. Jacob for Tara L. Hartse. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 12/5/2019. (SLT)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Devon M. Jacob to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee in Shell Case; receipt number 0869-3199574) by Tara L. Hartse. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PHV admission) (Pochop, Stephanie) Modified Docket Text on 11/21/2019 (DLC).
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 73 MEMO. (Attachments: #1 AO85)(SLT)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3199507) filed by BPLH, Tara L. Hartse, Dustin L. Hartse, BATH, KFH in shell case on 11/20/2019. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartse et al v. Murphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Norden, South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BPLH
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara L. Hartse
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Represented By: Devon M. Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KFH
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin L. Hartse
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Represented By: Devon M. Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BATH
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?