Cameron et al v. Sisseton Swimming Pool Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Cameron and Katie Cameron
Defendant: David Staub, City of Sisseton, South Dakota and Sisseton Swimming Pool Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01004
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tysdal, Matthew)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bruce Clark for Christopher Cameron and Katie Cameron. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 02/27/2020. (KLE)
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Sisseton Swimming Pool Association, Inc.. (Geyer, David)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by David Staub. (Rasmussen, Reed)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by David Staub. (Rasmussen, Reed)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Bruce Clark to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3263505) by Christopher Cameron, Katie Cameron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Tysdal, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 Separate ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by City of Sisseton, South Dakota. (Finer, Joshua)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua K. Finer on behalf of City of Sisseton, South Dakota. (Finer, Joshua)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Cameron, Katie Cameron. (Tysdal, Matthew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Geyer on behalf of Sisseton Swimming Pool Association, Inc.. (Geyer, David)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed A. Rasmussen on behalf of David Staub. (Rasmussen, Reed)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christopher Cameron served on Amber Kemnitz 1/28/2020. (Tysdal, Matthew) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (DJP).
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christopher Cameron served on David Staub on 1/31/2020. (Tysdal, Matthew) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (DJP).
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of COMPLAINT served on ADELINE VEFLIN (Registered Agent of Sisseton Swimming Pool Association) on 1/28/20, filed by Christopher Cameron. (Tysdal, Matthew) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (DJP).
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Sisseton, South Dakota, Sisseton Swimming Pool Association, Inc., David Staub. 3 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3244543) filed by Christopher Cameron, Katie Cameron in shell case on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem, #2 Exhibit 2- Letters of Guardianship Ad Litem) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron et al v. Sisseton Swimming Pool Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sisseton, South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisseton Swimming Pool Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cameron
Represented By: Matthew A. Tysdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Cameron
Represented By: Matthew A. Tysdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?