Hospitality Builders, Inc. v. Spokane South Medical, LLC
Plaintiff: Hospitality Builders, Inc.
Defendant: Spokane South Medical, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01017
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 10/8/2020. (SLW)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 Second DECLARATION of Sarah Baron Houy re #13 Response to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 to Baron Houy Decl (Memo ISO Mnt to Continue), #2 Exhibit 5 to Baron Houy Decl (HBI's Reply Memorandum), #3 Exhibit 6 to Baron Houy Decl (Order Granting HBI's Mtn to Continue Hearing)) (Baron Houy, Sarah) Modified on 10/8/2020 to add text (KLE).
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Expedite Dispostion of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Other Proeceedings (Doc. 1) filed by Spokane South Medical, LLC. (Baron Houy, Sarah)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite Dispostion of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Other Proeceedings #1 by Hospitality Builders, Inc.. (Hall, Ronald) Modified on 9/29/2020 to link (KLE).
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #11 Motion to Expedite was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hall, Ronald)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION to Expedite Disposition of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Other Proceedings (Doc. 1) by Hospitality Builders, Inc.. (Hall, Ronald) Modified on 9/29/2020 to add text and terminate motion (KLE).
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Motion Response re #1 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Other Proceedings filed by Hospitality Builders, Inc.. (Hall, Ronald)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM LETTER re: case caption. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 9/24/2020. (DJP)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Baron Houy on behalf of Spokane South Medical, LLC. (Baron Houy, Sarah)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Spokane South Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Baron Houy Decl (Mtn & Memo in Spt), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Baron Houy Decl (Mulloy Dec w Exhibits), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Baron Houy Decl (Note for Hrg)) (Baron Houy, Sarah)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Spokane South Medical, LLC. (Baron Houy, Sarah) Modified on 9/24/2020 to add text (KLE).
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Other Proceedings with Exs. A-H and Memorandum (Brief) in Support of Motion served on James Mulloy, Registered Agent for Spokane South Medical, LLC on 09/09/2020, filed by Hospitality Builders, Inc.. (Hall, Ronald)
September 22, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #4 Affidavit of Service, was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hall, Ronald)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Other Proceedings, Exhbits, and Memorandum in Support of Motion (DECLARATION OF SERVICE) served on James Mulloy, Registered Agent of Spokane South Medical, LLC on 9-17-20, filed by Hospitality Builders, Inc.. (Hall, Ronald) Modified on 9/22/2020 (CLR).
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of providing Rule 73 Memo and AO85 form to Plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: #1 AO85 Form)(DJP)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Other Proceedings filed by Hospitality Builders, Inc.. (Hall, Ronald)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel by Hospitality Builders, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Att. A - Contract, #2 Att B - Demand for Arbitration, #3 Att. C - Answering Statement and Counterclaim, #4 Ex D - Reply to Answering Statement and Counterclaims, #5 Ex E - Scheduling Order in Arbitration, #6 Att. F - Mechanic's Lien recorded in Spokane County, #7 Att. G - Complaint in Washington State Court to preserve, foreclose, #8 Att H - Answer and Counterclaims by Spokane South in Washington) (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hospitality Builders, Inc. v. Spokane South Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospitality Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokane South Medical, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Baron Houy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?