Voeltz-Schmit v. Milbrandt
Plaintiff: Chantel Voeltz-Schmit
Defendant: Brown County, South Dakota and Mark Milbrandt
Case Number: 1:2020cv01024
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11/20/20 Brown County Jail Prescription Drug Policy)(Leach, James)
November 20, 2020 ***Hearings terminated. Status conference scheduled for 11/24/20, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/20/20. (SKK)
November 18, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY to Motion Response re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice, #21 MOTION for Leave to File Brief re: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
November 18, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #26 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
November 16, 2020 Filing 28 ADMISSION OF SERVICE Executed 11/16/20 by Sheriff Milbrandt. Admission filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James) Modified text on 11/16/2020 (DJP).
November 16, 2020 Filing 27 BRIEF by Defendant Mark Milbrandt re #26 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1), #23 Memorandum in Support of Motion FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Peterson, Zachary)
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) by Mark Milbrandt. (Peterson, Zachary)
November 11, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEF by Plaintiff Chantel Voeltz-Schmit re #24 Order on Motion for Leave to File Brief re: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (Leach, James)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Brief. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/10/2010. (KLE)
November 10, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Brief re: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
November 10, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of James Leach in Support re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Brief re: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sheriff Milbrandt's new jail policy of November 2, 2020) (Leach, James) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (DJP).
November 10, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Brief re: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Leach, James)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Hearing set for 11/24/2020 at 11:00 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 - Room 403* before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/09/2020. (KLE)
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM LETTER re: possible hearing date. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/09/2020. (KLE)
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Mark Milbrandt. Summons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
November 5, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Parties and for Leave to Amend Complaint Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/05/2020. (KLE)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Substitute Party and for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Party and for Leave to Amend Complaint by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Class Action Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Leach, James)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Brown County, South Dakota. Summons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Hieb, Jack) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (DJP).
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Mark Milbrandt Brown County Sheriff re: #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Hieb, Jack) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (DJP).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 10/30/2020. (KLE)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary W. Peterson on behalf of Brown County, South Dakota. (Peterson, Zachary)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack H. Hieb on behalf of Brown County, South Dakota. (Hieb, Jack)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Declaration of James D. Leach in support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email string including statement of jail policy re: prescription medications, #2 Exhibit Email from J. Leach to E. Thompson, Brown Co States Attorney) (Leach, James) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (DJP).
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Declaration of Chantel Voeltz-Schmit in support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (DJP).
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (Leach, James)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3420661) filed by Chantel Voeltz-Schmit. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voeltz-Schmit v. Milbrandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel Voeltz-Schmit
Represented By: James D. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown County, South Dakota
Represented By: Zachary W. Peterson
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Christopher C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Milbrandt
Represented By: Zachary W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?