Waliezer v. Larson
Plaintiff: Shane D. Waliezer
Defendant: Jeff Larson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01021
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 10/06/2021. MAILING copy of Order to Shane Waliezer on 10/07/2021. (SAC)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane D. Waliezer. (VMM)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 Mail sent to Shane Waliezer was returned as undeliverable. Docket Sheet was returned. Mailed to updated address. (MSB)
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JLS)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Shane D. Waliezer re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JLS)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shane D. Waliezer (JLS)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER Received from Plaintiff to Clerk of Courts requesting case documents. (DJP)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER Received from Plaintiff to Clerk of Courts with attached Order Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis from Western District of Washington. (DJP)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shane D. Waliezer (DJP)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Shane D. Waliezer re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (DJP)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER Received from Shane Waliezer re. status of pending motions. Docket Sheet sent on 09/21/2021. (MSB)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (Attachments: #1 cover letter) (JLS)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury. Although a new case has been opened, your application to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (JLS)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of alternate address by Shane D. Waliezer. (JLS)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane D. Waliezer. (JLS)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shane D. Waliezer. (JLS)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waliezer v. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane D. Waliezer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?