Waliezer v. Howell et al
Plaintiff: Shane D. Waliezer
Defendant: Brad Howell, Officer John Doe #1 and Officer John Doe #2
Case Number: 1:2021cv01027
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: 18 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, was filed in error and should be disregarded. (SLT) Modified on 11/23/2021 deliverd to Shane D. Waliezer and Codington County Jail Financial Department via usps (SLT).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TRANSMITTAL of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #19 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Notice of Filing Error, 20 Order on Ex Parte Motion, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. (SLT)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/22/2021. (SLT) Modified on 11/22/2021 to correct judge (SLT). Modified on 11/22/2021 delivered to Shane D. Waliezer via usps with (SLT).
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TRANSMITTAL of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re 18 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,.. (SLT)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of USCA directing Clerk of the District Court to forward portions of the original record not available in an electronic format through PACER to USCA within 10 days re #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Shane D. Waliezer.. (TAL)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of USCA directing Appellant to either pay the appellate docketing fee to the District Court or file a pleading in the Appellate Court explaining why he is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Shane D. Waliezer. (TAL)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 USCA Case Number for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Shane D. Waliezer. USCA Case Number: 21-3539. (TAL)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal. (SLT)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLT)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appeal Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration by Shane D. Waliezer. (SLT)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane D. Waliezer.. (SLT)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) by Shane D. Waliezer. (CLR)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Clerical Error by Shane D. Waliezer. (Correction to caption made; copy of updated docket sheet mailed to Plaintiff). (CLR)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (VACATED) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 10/06/2021. MAILING copy of Order to Shane Waliezer on 10/07/2021. (SAC) Modified on 11/23/2021 (SLT).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane D. Waliezer. (CLR)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (CLR)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shane D. Waliezer. (CLR)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (CLR)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane D. Waliezer. (CLR)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waliezer v. Howell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane D. Waliezer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?