Torgerson v. Roberts County, South Dakota et al
Defendant: Roberts County, South Dakota, Tyler Appel, Zachary Angerhofer and Wesley Bowsher
Counter Defendant: Leslie Torgerson
Counter Claimant: Ross Torgerson and Terri Torgerson
Case Number: 1:2022cv01008
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan S. Vogel on behalf of Zachary Angerhofer, Tyler Appel, Wesley Bowsher, Roberts County, South Dakota. (Vogel, Ryan)
July 18, 2022 Filing 23 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #20 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Ross Torgerson by Leslie Torgerson. (Wilka, Thomas)
July 18, 2022 Filing 22 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Terri Torgerson by Leslie Torgerson. (Wilka, Thomas)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 07/07/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Letter to Counsel)(KLE)
July 6, 2022 Filing 20 Defendant Ross Torgerson's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Leslie Torgerson by Ross Torgerson. (Kuck, Scott)
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Leslie Torgerson by Terri Torgerson. (Geyer, David)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Geyer on behalf of Terri Torgerson. (Geyer, David)
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott T. Kuck on behalf of Ross Torgerson. (Kuck, Scott)
June 30, 2022 Filing 16 SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Zachary Angerhofer, Tyler Appel, Wesley Bowsher, Roberts County, South Dakota. (Hieb, Jack)
June 21, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Wesley Bowsher on June 15, 2022 (Wilka, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Zachary Angerhofer on June 14, 2022 (Wilka, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Roberts County, South Dakota on June 13, 2022 (Wilka, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Ross Torgerson on June 15, 2022 (Wilka, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Terri Torgerson on June 15, 2022 (Wilka, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Sheriff Tyler Appel on June 13, 2022, filed by Leslie Torgerson. (Wilka, Thomas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 blank AO 85)(DLC)
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Leslie Torgerson. (Wilka, Thomas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR, wrong event used) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Torgerson vs. Roberts County, S.D.). Zachary Angerhofer (Wilka, Thomas) Modified on 6/10/2022 - removed restriction (SAC).
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR, wrong event used) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Torgerson vs. Roberts County, S.D.). Wesley Bowsher (Wilka, Thomas) Modified on 6/10/2022 - removed restriction (SAC).
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR, wrong event used) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Torgerson vs. Roberts County, S.D.). Tyler Appel (Wilka, Thomas) Modified on 6/10/2022 - removed restriction (SAC).
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR, wrong event used) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Torgerson vs. Roberts County, S.D.). Terri Torgerson (Wilka, Thomas) Modified on 6/10/2022 - removed restriction (SAC).
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR, wrong event used) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Torgerson vs. Roberts County, S.D.). Ross Torgerson (Wilka, Thomas) Modified on 6/10/2022 - removed restriction (SAC).
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR, wrong event used) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Torgerson vs. Roberts County, S.D.). Roberts County, South Dakota (Wilka, Thomas) Modified on 6/10/2022 - removed restriction (SAC).
June 10, 2022 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons was filed in error and should be disregarded. (SAC)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3809160, in shell case on 06/09/2022 filed by Leslie Torgerson on 06/09/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment -Photos) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torgerson v. Roberts County, South Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Leslie Torgerson
Represented By: Thomas K. Wilka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts County, South Dakota
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Ryan S. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Appel
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Ryan S. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Angerhofer
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Ryan S. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Bowsher
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Ryan S. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ross Torgerson
Represented By: Scott T. Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Terri Torgerson
Represented By: David A. Geyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?