LaBatte v. Gangle et al
Plaintiff: Brendan LaBatte
Defendant: Karen Gangle, Gary Gaikowski, Hon. Michael Swallow and Hon. Ruth Burns
Case Number: 1:2024cv01014
Filed: July 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Schulte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 USCA Case Number and Appeal Briefing Schedule Order for #34 Notice of Appeal filed by Brendan LaBatte. USCA Case Number: 24-2798 Transcript due by 10/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Briefing Schedule). (TAL)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #34 Notice of Appeal. (SAC)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #32 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Brendan LaBatte. (paid $605 Appellate Filing fee; receipt number BSDDC-4359235). (Doody, Robert)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte on 08/30/2024. (KLE)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION and ORDER granting #26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and denying #2 and #20 Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte on 08/30/2024. (KLE)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2024 re #26 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Failure to Join a Required Party filed by Ruth Burns, Karen Gangle, Michael Swallow, Gary Gaikowski before U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Hook) (SKK)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY to #26 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #28 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Brendan LaBatte. (Doody, Robert)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Regarding Motion Hearing. Signed by U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte on 08/12/2024. (KLE)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY W. BILLION in Support re #26 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Failure to Join a Required Party filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tribal Court Proceeding, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion to Dismiss DUI and Order) (Billion, Timothy) Modified docket text on 8/8/2024 (SAC).
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Failure to Join a Required Party filed by All Defendants. (Billion, Timothy)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Failure to Join a Required Party by Ruth Burns, Gary Gaikowski, Karen Gangle, Michael Swallow. (Billion, Timothy)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CLEAN. COPY filed by All Defendants. (Billion, Timothy)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Produce.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte on 08/06/2024. (KLE)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Status Conference held on 8/6/2024 before U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte. (Court Reporter: Deanna Clayborne) (SKK)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Dawn Drum re #21 Response to Motion Rule 37(e). (Billion, Timothy)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 First MOTION to Produce TRIBAL CODE AND DECISIONS filed by All Defendants. (Billion, Timothy)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CLEAN. COPY by Brendan LaBatte. (Doody, Robert)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 First AMENDED COMPLAINT CLEAN filed by Brendan LaBatte. (Doody, Robert)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Status Conference set for 8/6/2024 at 02:00 PM in Pierre Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte. Signed by U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte on 8/5/2024. (CV)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte on 08/02/2024. (KLE)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First MOTION to Produce TRIBAL CODE AND DECISIONS by Brendan LaBatte. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence Request for documents) (Doody, Robert)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gregory S. Paulson for Defendants Ruth Burns, Gary Gaikowski, Karen Gangle and Michael Swallow.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte on 08/01/2024. (KLE)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun M. Eastman on behalf of All Defendants. (Eastman, Shaun)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan A. LaFromboise on behalf of All Defendants. (LaFromboise, Megan)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, was filed in error and should be disregarded. (LaFromboise, Megan)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Greg S. Paulson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4336826) by Ruth Burns, Gary Gaikowski, Karen Gangle, Michael Swallow. (Billion, Timothy)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Appearance by Ruth Burns, Gary Gaikowski, Karen Gangle, Michael Swallow. (LaFromboise, Megan) Modified on 8/1/2024 - contacted atty to refile using the correct event and correct atty login (SAC).
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Appearance by Michael Swallow. (LaFromboise, Megan) Modified on 8/1/2024 - contacted atty to refile using the correct event (SAC).
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Appearance by Ruth Burns, Gary Gaikowski, Karen Gangle. (LaFromboise, Megan) Modified on 8/1/2024 - contacted atty to refile using the correct event (SAC).
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan V. Johnson on behalf of All Defendants. (Johnson, Brendan)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct by Brendan LaBatte. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment - Proposed Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Doody, Robert) Modified docket text on 8/1/2024 (SAC).
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W. Billion on behalf of All Defendants. (Billion, Timothy)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brendan LaBatte Subpoena Kirchmeier. (Doody, Robert)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte Signed by U.S. District Judge Eric C. Schulte on 07/24/2024. (KLE)
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brendan LaBatte. All Defendants. (Doody, Robert)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter to Megan LaFromboise SWO Attorney. (Doody, Robert)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Brendan LaBatte. (Doody, Robert)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4322337, in shell case on 07/11/2024 filed by Brendan LaBatte. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Opinion of the Court of Appeals, #2 Attachment 2- Memorandum Opinion and Order, #3 Attachment 3-Tribal Counsel Resolution, #4 Attachment 4- Incident Report, #5 Attachment 5-Complaint, #6 Attachment 6- Judgment of Conviction, #7 Attachment 7- Motion to Dismiss) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaBatte v. Gangle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan LaBatte
Represented By: Robert J. Doody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Gangle
Represented By: Shaun M. Eastman
Represented By: Megan A. LaFromboise
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Represented By: Gregory S. Paulson
Represented By: Gregory S. Paulson
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gaikowski
Represented By: Shaun M. Eastman
Represented By: Megan A. LaFromboise
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Represented By: Gregory S. Paulson
Represented By: Gregory S. Paulson
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Michael Swallow
Represented By: Shaun M. Eastman
Represented By: Megan A. LaFromboise
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Represented By: Gregory S. Paulson
Represented By: Gregory S. Paulson
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Ruth Burns
Represented By: Shaun M. Eastman
Represented By: Megan A. LaFromboise
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Represented By: Gregory S. Paulson
Represented By: Gregory S. Paulson
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?