Artichoker v. Todd County School District
Plaintiff: Karen Artichoker
Defendant: Todd County School District
Case Number: 3:2015cv03021
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Central Division Office
County: Todd
Presiding Judge: Roberto A. Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 57 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 6/9/2017. (JLS)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Opinion and Order on Pending Motions and Affirming Hearing Examiner Decision; granting 38 Motion for Leave to Submit Additional Evidence; granting 41 Motion Supplement the Record with Admissions ; denying 42 Motion to Determine Sufficiency to Defendant's Answers to Request for Admissions; denying as moot 44 Motion for Order Directing Counsel for the Defendant to Sign the District's Responses to the Plaintiff's Request for Admissions; denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/29/2016. (JLS)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Opinion and ORDER denying 9 Motion to Strike but Extending Time to File Reply to Counterclaim. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 4/15/16. (SLW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artichoker v. Todd County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Artichoker
Represented By: Dana Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?