Sapienza et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Sapienza and Sarah Jones Sapienza, M.D.
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv03015
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brandt, Angela)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caryn A. Boisen. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/10/2018. (LH)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Hieb, Jack) Modified on 10/3/2018 (SLT).
October 2, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hieb, Jack)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Separate Answer of Defendants Joseph Sapienza and Sarah Jones Sapienza, M.D., #2 Exhibit 2 - Stipulation for Scheduling Order and Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Notice of Deposition of Joseph Sapienza and Amended Notice of Deposition of Sarah Jones Sapienza, M.D., #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Release of Supersedeas Bond and Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Forfeit Supersedeas Bon of Defendants dated July 27, 2017) (Hieb, Jack)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Hieb, Jack) Modified on 10/3/2018 (SLT).
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Hieb, Jack)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Hieb, Jack)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Caryn A. Boisen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2887239) by Joseph Sapienza, Sarah Jones Sapienza, MD. (Brandt, Angela)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christian A. Preus. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 09/26/2018. (LH)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Christian A. Preus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2883698) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Hieb, Jack)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack H. Hieb on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Hieb, Jack)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. 1 original summons, 1 A085, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(SST)
September 7, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Joseph Sapienza, Sarah Jones Sapienza, MD. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2870907. (SST)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SST)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Sapienza, Sarah Jones Sapienza, MD in shell case on 9/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in state case, #2 Exhibit B - Homeowners Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Excess Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Memorandum Decision, #5 Exhibit E - 3/7/17 Liberty Mutual Denial Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Supreme Court Decision) (SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sapienza et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sapienza
Represented By: Angela Beranek Brandt
Represented By: Caryn A. Boisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Jones Sapienza, M.D.
Represented By: Angela Beranek Brandt
Represented By: Caryn A. Boisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christian A. Preus
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?