Institute for Free Speech v. Jackley et al

Plaintiff: Institute for Free Speech
Defendant: Marty Jackley and Shantel Krebs
Case Number: 3:2018cv03017
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Amend Verified Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/30/2018. (LH)
November 20, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Marty Jackley, Shantel Krebs. (Mines-Bailey, Ann)
October 31, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Marty Jackley, Shantel Krebs. (Mines-Bailey, Ann)
October 26, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Institute for Free Speech. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Verified Complaint) (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 17, 2018 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction) held on October 12, 2018 before Judge Roberto A. Lange. Court Reporter: Connie Heckenlaible, Telephone number 605-945-4622. Transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Redaction Request of this transcript. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2019. (CJH)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER CONCERNING MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/16/2018. (LH)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2018 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Institute for Free Speech before U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange. (Court Reporter: Connie Heckenlaible) (JLS)
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten E. Jasper on behalf of All Defendants. (Jasper, Kirsten)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Williams on behalf of All Defendants. (Williams, Richard)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann F. Mines-Bailey on behalf of Marty Jackley, Shantel Krebs. (Mines-Bailey, Ann)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Shantel Krebs served on October 10, 2018. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Marty Jackley served on October 10, 2018. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Institute for Free Speech re #12 Notice, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #13 Notice, #6 MOTION for Attorney Parker Douglas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2891620), #7 MOTION for Attorney Parker Douglas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2891649), #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Institute for Free Speech of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Institute for Free Speech of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2018 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/10/2018. (LH)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas Parker. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/10/2018. (LH)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allen Dickerson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/10/2018. (LH)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Marty Jackley, Shantel Krebs. 2 original summons, 3 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2 AO 85 Form)(SKK)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Parker Douglas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2891649) by Institute for Free Speech. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Allen Dickerson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2891620) by Institute for Free Speech. (Hansen, Jonathon) Modified Docket Text on 10/9/2018 (DLC).
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Institute for Free Speech. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Institute for Free Speech. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Institute for Free Speech. (Hansen, Jonathon)
October 8, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Institute for Free Speech. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2891034. (DLC)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DLC)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Institute for Free Speech in shell case on 10/08/18. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Institute for Free Speech v. Jackley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Jackley
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Represented By: Kirsten E. Jasper
Represented By: Ann F. Mines-Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantel Krebs
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Represented By: Kirsten E. Jasper
Represented By: Ann F. Mines-Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Free Speech
Represented By: Lisa M. Prostrollo
Represented By: Jonathon D. Hansen
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Represented By: Allen Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?