Lauing et al v. Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Dustin Lauing, Bernard Lauing, JD Lauing and Eugenie Lauing
Defendant: Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc. and RCP
Case Number: 3:2019cv03006
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 03/26/2019. (LH)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc. served on CT Corporation System. (Purtell, Vincent)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Genesee & Wyoming Inc. (Donahoe, Brian) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (DJP).
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Weinstein on behalf of Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Weinstein, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Answer of Defendant ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Donahoe, Brian)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Donahoe on behalf of Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Donahoe, Brian)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc. 1 original summons, 1 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85 Form)(SAC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-2994809) filed by Bernard Lauing, John Dustin Lauing, Eugenie Lauing in shell case on 2/21/19. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauing et al v. Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dustin Lauing
Represented By: Vincent A. Purtell
Represented By: Scott N. Heidepriem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Lauing
Represented By: Vincent A. Purtell
Represented By: Scott N. Heidepriem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD Lauing
Represented By: Vincent A. Purtell
Represented By: Scott N. Heidepriem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenie Lauing
Represented By: Vincent A. Purtell
Represented By: Scott N. Heidepriem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid City, Pierre and Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Donahoe
Represented By: Daniel B. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCP
Represented By: Brian J. Donahoe
Represented By: Daniel B. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?