Millard v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Roy Derek Millard and Derek Roy Millard
Defendant: Rosebud Sioux Tribe and The United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv03015
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of The United States of America. (Druley (USA), Delia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant The United States of America on Diana Ryan, Chief Civil Division (Haigh, Tyler)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Derek Roy Millard. (Haigh, Tyler) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct text (CLR).
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3127243) filed by Derek Roy Millard in shell case on 8/7/2019. (CLR) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct text (CLR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millard v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Derek Millard
Represented By: Tyler Haigh
Represented By: Ryan W.W. Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Roy Millard
Represented By: Tyler Haigh
Represented By: Ryan W.W. Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebud Sioux Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?