Zeisler et al v. Hickey et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Zeisler and Kendall Zeisler
Defendant: David Hickey and Farmers National Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03016
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by David Hickey. (Fuller, William)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tiffany S. Boutcher for Farmers National Company,Tiffany S. Boutcher for David Hickey. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/07/2020. (LH)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gretchen L. McGill for Farmers National Company,Gretchen L. McGill for David Hickey. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/07/2020. (LH)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Farmers National Company . (Riter-Rapp, Lindsey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Tiffany S. Boutcher to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3403708) by Farmers National Company. (Riter-Rapp, Lindsey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Gretchen L. McGill to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3403698) by Farmers National Company. (Riter-Rapp, Lindsey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Farmers National Company. (Riter-Rapp, Lindsey)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 09/29/2020. (LH)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Jason Rumpca on behalf of Farmers National Company. (Rumpca, A.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Riter-Rapp on behalf of Farmers National Company. (Riter-Rapp, Lindsey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by David Hickey. (Fuller, William)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Fuller on behalf of David Hickey. (Fuller, William)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by David Hickey AMENDED Notice and Motion for Removal of Action. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Filing of Notice of and Motion for Removal of Action to District Court, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit NOA - Tiede, #5 Exhibit Return Service - Farmers National Co, #6 Exhibit Return Service - Hickey)(Fuller, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by David Hickey AND MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF ACTION TO DISTRICT COURT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit NOA - Tiede, #4 Exhibit FNC - Service, #5 Exhibit Hickey - Service)(Fuller, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 73 Memo and AO85 form. (Attachments: #1 AO85 Form)(JLS)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3399686) (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Plaintiff's Complaint)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeisler et al v. Hickey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Zeisler
Represented By: Jacob W. Tiede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Zeisler
Represented By: Jacob W. Tiede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hickey
Represented By: Lindsey Riter-Rapp
Represented By: Gretchen L. McGill
Represented By: Tiffany S. Boutcher
Represented By: William P. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers National Company
Represented By: Lindsey Riter-Rapp
Represented By: Gretchen L. McGill
Represented By: A. Jason Rumpca
Represented By: Tiffany S. Boutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?