Rasmussen v. Baxter et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt W. Rasmussen
Defendant: Dustin Baxter, Brandon Fleagle, Guy DiBenedetto and Stanley County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 3:2021cv03021
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Mark A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Abraham on behalf of Dustin Baxter, Brandon Fleagle. (Abraham, Douglas)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dustin Baxter, Brandon Fleagle. (Anderson, Robert)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of Dustin Baxter, Brandon Fleagle. (Anderson, Robert)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Amend to add Guy DiBenedetto, in his official capacityre #14 Amended Complaint by Wyatt W. Rasmussen. (JLS)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT. (JLS)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/15/2021. (JLS)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Mail sent to Wyatt W. Rasmussen was returned as undeliverable. Mailed blank subpoenas to new address. (VMM)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Wyatt W. Rasmussen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (VMM)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dustin Baxter, Brandon Fleagle. 2 Summons(es), Doc. #7 Order, Doc #1 Complaint, and AO 85s for each party delivered to SF USMS. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 AO 85)(VMM)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Service LETTER with enclosed sample summons and USM285, blank summons, blank usm 285s, Rule 73 Memo, AO85, doc 7 and Rule 4 sent by Clerk's Office to Wyatt Rasmussen. (JLS)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 1915 Screening. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/10/2021. (JLS)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Wyatt W. Rasmussen. (JLS)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. A new case has been opened. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (JLS)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Wyatt W. Rasmussen. Pro se party Wyatt W. Rasmussen will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (JLS)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wyatt W. Rasmussen. (JLS)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmussen v. Baxter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt W. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Baxter
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Fleagle
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy DiBenedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?