Blue State Refugees et al v. Noem et al
Plaintiff: Blue State Refugees, Luke Robertson and Chad Dollick
Defendant: Kristi Noem, Scott Bollinger, Brent Gill and Leah Svendsen
Case Number: 3:2021cv03024
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Mark A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/17/21. (Lange, Roberto)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Stipulation FOR CONSENT DECREE filed by Luke Robertson, Chad Dollick, Blue State Refugees. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/17/21. (SKK)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR CONSENT DECREE AND ENTRY OF ORDER by Blue State Refugees, Chad Dollick, Luke Robertson. (Hegge, Stacy)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER AND RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on December 3, 2021. (DLC)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Terminate Motions, filed by Blue State Refugees, Chad Dollick, Luke Robertson. (Hegge, Stacy)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Terminate Motions, by Blue State Refugees, Chad Dollick, Luke Robertson. (Hegge, Stacy)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION AND ORDER CANCELLING HEARING AND DENYING INJUNCTION REQUEST AS MOOT. ***Hearing terminated, Motion denied as moot without prejudice #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Luke Robertson, Chad Dollick, Blue State Refugees. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on November 5, 2021. (DLC)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY ALAN GURA granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan Gura for Blue State Refugees,Alan Gura for Chad Dollick,Alan Gura for Luke Robertson. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on November 5, 2021. (DLC)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery J. Tronvold on behalf of Scott Bollinger, Brent Gill, Kristi Noem, Leah Svendsen. (Tronvold, Jeffery)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Stacy R. Hegge . (Hegge, Stacy)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Alan Gura to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number BSDDC-3663603) by Blue State Refugees. (Hegge, Stacy)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2021 at 11:00 AM in Pierre Courtroom 1 - Room 436 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on November 4, 2021. (DLC) Emailed Order and DE 1 and 3-9 to Charles McGuigan at the Attorney General's Office, received an acknowledgment of receipt at 9:08 a.m. on 11/4/2021 (DLC).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER by Blue State Refugees, Chad Dollick, Luke Robertson re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Hegge, Stacy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Luke Robertson re #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Email) (Hegge, Stacy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Sara Lynn Bouzek re #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Hegge, Stacy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Chad Dollick re #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Hegge, Stacy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Blue State Refugees, Chad Dollick, Luke Robertson. (Hegge, Stacy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Blue State Refugees, Chad Dollick, Luke Robertson. (Hegge, Stacy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Blue State Refugees, Chad Dollick, Luke Robertson. (Hegge, Stacy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX500006734, in shell case on 11/3/2021 filed by Blue State Refugees, Chad Dollick, Luke Robertson on 11/3/2021. (CLR)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #2 Motion for TRO was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hegge, Stacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue State Refugees et al v. Noem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue State Refugees
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Represented By: Catherine A. Seeley
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Robertson
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Represented By: Catherine A. Seeley
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Dollick
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Represented By: Catherine A. Seeley
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Noem
Represented By: Jeffery J. Tronvold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bollinger
Represented By: Jeffery J. Tronvold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Gill
Represented By: Jeffery J. Tronvold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Svendsen
Represented By: Jeffery J. Tronvold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?