Shaff et al v. Claymore et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Shaff and Keith Fodness
Defendant: Judge Brenda Claymore, Judge Margaret Egan and Charles Red Crow
Case Number: 3:2023cv03029
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Mark A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Filing 8 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/15/2023. (ARW)
November 15, 2023 Filing 7 Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/15/2023 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. (Court Reporter: Connie Heckenlaible) (SKK)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Gunn on behalf of Brenda Claymore, Margaret Egan, Charles Red Crow. (Gunn, Steven)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Brenda Claymore, Margaret Egan, Charles Red Crow of Dismissal with Prejudice of Tribal Court Civil Action and Suggestion of Mootness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice), #3 Exhibit C (Order of Dismissal with Prejudice), #4 Exhibit D (Tribal Resolution No. E-248-2023-CR))(Gunn, Steven)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER., Hearings Set( Status Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 03:00 PM in Pierre Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange.) Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/14/23. (KMH)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/8/2023. (Emailed to Lillian Alvernaz)(ARW)
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 3 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SKK)
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sarah Shaff, Keith Fodness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Emergency Petition, #2 Exhibit B: Civil Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Tribal Court Brief re: Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D: Order of Dismissal, #5 Exhibit E: Declaration of E.S., #6 Exhibit F: Tribal Court Brief re: Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit G: Emergency Exclusion Order, #8 Exhibit H: Notice of Special Appearance, #9 Exhibit I: Motion to Dismiss and Alternative, #10 Exhibit J: Affidavit of Cindy Lindskov, #11 Exhibit K: Affidavit of Keith Fodness, #12 Exhibit L: Affidavit of Lance Frazier, #13 Exhibit M: Affidavit of Harold Hollow, #14 Exhibit N: Defendant's Reply Brief) (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaff et al v. Claymore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Shaff
Represented By: A. Jason Rumpca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Fodness
Represented By: A. Jason Rumpca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Brenda Claymore
Represented By: Steven J. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Margaret Egan
Represented By: Steven J. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Red Crow
Represented By: Steven J. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?