Bagola v. Department of Social Services
Plaintiff: Doreen C. Bagola
Defendant: Department of Social Services
Case Number: 3:2024cv03014
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of USCA directing Clerk of the District Court to forward portions of the original record not available in an electronic format through PACER to USCA within 10 days re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Doreen C. Bagola.. (TAL)
June 7, 2024 Filing 10 USCA Case Number for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Doreen C. Bagola. USCA Case Number: 24-2169. (TAL)
June 7, 2024 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal. (JMS)
June 7, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Judgment of Dismissal by Doreen C. Bagola. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Attachment to Letter). (JMS)
June 7, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Doreen C. Bagola. (JMS)
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 JUDGMENT of Dismissal. Sent to Doreen C. Bagola with Appeal Packet via USPS (SKK) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/8/2024) (SKK).
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis anddenying as moot #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 05/08/2024. cc: mailed to Doreen C. Bagola via USPS. (KLE)
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Doreen C. Bagola. (CLR)
May 1, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Doreen C. Bagola. (CLR)
May 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Doreen C. Bagola. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (CLR) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/1/2024 to rotate upside down pages) (KLE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagola v. Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen C. Bagola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?