Cullison et al v. Hilti, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Cullison, Jr. and Amber Cullison
Defendant: Hilti, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv04122
Filed: August 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 85 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/28/2011. (KC)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 65 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/22/2011. (KC)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/12/2011. (KC)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Compel. Signed by U.S.Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 7/21/2011. (CG)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 19 Motion to Extend Deadlines (Discovery due by 12/20/2010, Motions due by 1/20/2011). Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 08/19/2010. (KC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cullison et al v. Hilti, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cullison, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley G. Bonynge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Cullison
Represented By: Bradley G. Bonynge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilti, Inc.
Represented By: William P. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?