Dziadek v. The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Laura Dziadek
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv04134
Filed: September 20, 2011
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Roberto A. Lange
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 342 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting only as to the $500,000 jury award for mental and emotional harm, otherwise denying 317 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 318 Motion for New Trial. Dziadek's three declaratory judgment claims are dismissed as moot. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 9/30/16. (SLW)
August 16, 2016 336 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 312 Charter Oak's Motion for Permission to Contact Jurors. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/16/2016. (LH)
June 14, 2016 315 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTACT JURORS. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 06/14/2016. (LH)
May 2, 2016 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 27 PENDING MOTIONS: granting 165 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 176 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion in Limine; denying 178 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 180 Motion in L imine; deferring ruling on 181 Motion in Limine; denying 182 Motion in Limine; denying 183 Motion in Limine; granting 184 Motion in Limine; granting 185 Motion in Limine; denying 187 Motion in Limine; granting 188 Motion in Limine ; denying 190 Motion in Limine; granting 191 Motion in Limine; denying 192 Motion in Limine; denying 193 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 202 Motion in Limine; granting 203 Motion in Limine; granting in part 204 Motion in Limine; granting 205 Motion in Limine; denying in part 206 Motion in Limine; granting 207 Motion in Limine; granting 208 Motion in Limine; granting in part 213 Motion to Exclude; denying 223 Motion to Strike ; granting 248 Motion to Strike. Non-expert witnesses - other than Dziadek and one corporate representative of Charter Oak - are to be sequestered during witness testimony. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 5/2/16. (SLW)
April 22, 2016 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 161 Motion to Quash to the extent that Charter Oak's subpoena to Farmers Insurance Exchange is hereby quashed; denying 167 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 170 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 172 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 174 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 170 Motion o certify question to South Dakota Supreme Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 4/22/16. (DJP)
February 25, 2016 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 137 Motion to Unseal Document; granting 147 Motion to Seal Existing Document and granting 148 Motion to Seal Document. See order for further details. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 2/25/16. (DJP)
December 1, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 118 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/1/15. (SKK)
April 22, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Requiring Production of Documents Produced in Camera. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 4/22/14. (JLS)
March 3, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Compel and granting 45 Fourth MOTION to Continue. Signed by U. S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 3/3/14. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dziadek v. The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Dziadek
Represented By: Daniel K. Brendtro
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy A. Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?