O'Neal v. Remington Arms Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carol O'Neal
Defendant: Remington Arms Company, LLC, Sporting Goods Properties, Inc. and E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv04182
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying 94 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/14/16. (SLW)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 84 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/10/2014. (KC)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 47 Motion to Exclude; granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/13/2014. (KC)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/19/2012. (KC)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss Count V. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/3/2012. (KC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neal v. Remington Arms Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol O'Neal
Represented By: John P. Blackburn
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Cook
Represented By: Timothy W. Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Arms Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew A. Lothson
Represented By: James Ellis Moore
Represented By: Dale G. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sporting Goods Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew A. Lothson
Represented By: James Ellis Moore
Represented By: Dale G. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Andrew A. Lothson
Represented By: James Ellis Moore
Represented By: Dale G. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?