Waldner v. James et al
Plaintiff: Roger D. Waldner
Defendant: James Law, P.C., Timothy L. James and James & Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2012cv04153
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/19/2014. (KC)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/21/2014. (KC)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 8 Motion to take judicial notice; granting 9 Motion to take judicial notice; granting 10 Motion to take judicial notice ; granting 11 Motion to take judicial notice; granting 12 Motion to take judicial notice; granting 13 M otion to take judicial notice; granting 14 Motion to take judicial notice; granting (15) Motion to take judicial notice; denying 17 Motion to Strike; denying 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/21/2013. (KC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldner v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Law, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James & Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D. Waldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?