Dale v. Dejong et al
Plaintiff: James Irving Dale
Defendant: Kelly Tjeerdsma, Michael Meyer, Rebecca Schiefer, George Deglman, Unknown Department of Corrections Medical Staff, Unknown Department of Corrections Staff, Robert Dooley and Tammy Dejong
Case Number: 4:2014cv04102
Filed: July 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Bon Homme
Presiding Judge: John E. Simko
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying motion to rescind or clarify order (Doc. 97 in 04-4153). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 1/9/2018. (CG)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Dismiss; terminating as moot 91 Report and Recommendation; terminating as moot 92 Objection to Report and Recommendation.; adopting in part 93 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 94 Objection to Report and Recommendation. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 2/17/17. (SLW)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER amending 52 Adoption of Report and Recommendation. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 4/13/16. (DJP) (Main Document 61 replaced on 4/13/2016) (DJP).
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying as moot in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/28/2016. (CG)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting 46 Report and Recommendation; denying 47 Objection to Report and Recommendation.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/21/15. (DJP)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER adopting 34 Report and Recommendation; denying 35 Objection to Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/8/15. (DJP)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 15 and 24 Motions to amend/supplement complaint. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 4/13/2015. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale v. Dejong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Irving Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Tjeerdsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Schiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Deglman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department of Corrections Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department of Corrections Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Dejong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?