United States of America, for the use and benefit of Ash Equipment Co., Inc. et al v. Morris, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United States of America, for the use and benefit of Ash Equipment Co., Inc. and Ash Equipment Co., Inc.
Defendant: Morris, Inc., United Fire and Casualty Company and Red Wilk Construction, Inc.
Cross_claimant: Morris, Inc. and United Fire and Casualty Company
Cross_defendant: Red Wilk Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv04131
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/6/2016. (CG)
August 18, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 55 Alternative Motion for Rule 56(f) Relief. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/18/16. (DJP)
July 28, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/28/2016. (CG)
May 24, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 5/24/2016. (CG)
September 29, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/29/15. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, for the use and benefit of Ash Equipment Co., Inc. et al v. Morris, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, for the use and benefit of Ash Equipment Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Donahoe
Represented By: Joseph M. Dylla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ash Equipment Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Donahoe
Represented By: Joseph M. Dylla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald G. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Ronald G. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Wilk Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Morris, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald G. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: United Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Ronald G. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Red Wilk Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?