Libertarian Party of South Dakota et al v. Krebs et al
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of South Dakota, Ken Santema, Bob Newland, Constitution Party of South Dakota, Lori Stacey and Joy Howe
Defendant: Shantel Krebs and Marty J. Jackley
Case Number: 4:2015cv04111
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/2/2018. (DJP)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 2/21/18. (DJP)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 102 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/19/2017. (JLS)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMRANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 69 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/31/16. (SLW)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 60 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/15/16. (SLW)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/9/16. (SLW)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss, 8 Motion to Change Venue; granting 12 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/26/16. (DJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Libertarian Party of South Dakota et al v. Krebs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of South Dakota
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Santema
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Newland
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constitution Party of South Dakota
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Stacey
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Howe
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: M. Laughlin McDonald
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantel Krebs
Represented By: Ellie J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty J. Jackley
Represented By: Ellie J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?