Brende v. Young et al
Petitioner: Steven Allen Brende
Respondent: Darin Young and Marty Jackley
Case Number: 4:2016cv04084
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Veronica L. Duffy
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying as moot 38 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal; denying 42 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/7/17. (SLW)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting 29 Report and Recommendation; granting 17 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 13 Motion to Expedite; denying as moot 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 27 Motion to Dismiss; denying 28 Motion; denying as moot 30 Motion ; denying as moot 31 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 31 Motion to Seal Case; denying as moot 32 Motion ; denying as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part Certificate of Appealability. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/31/2017. (JLS)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 6 Motion for transcripts. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 6/24/2016. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brende v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Allen Brende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darin Young
Represented By: Patricia J. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marty Jackley
Represented By: Patricia J. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?